MO HB184 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the sales tax on motor vehicles, the transient guest tax in Pettis County, and enhanced enterprise zones and establishes the Missouri Works Program
Title
Changes the laws regarding the sales tax on motor vehicles, the transient guest tax in Pettis County, and enhanced enterprise zones and establishes the Missouri Works Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-11 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-17 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 92 NOES: 63 |
2013-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 98 NOES: 59 |
2013-05-17 | House | House Concurs (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 98 NOES: 58 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 16, 2013, 9:30AM, SCR 1 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 24, 2013, 12:00 p.m., or Upon Morning Recess, Senate Lounge |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 10 |
2013-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill Reconsidered (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2013-01-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |