MO HB1831 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding the sales tax holiday that occurs in early August by adding an exemption for disposable diapers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding the sales tax holiday that occurs in early August by adding an exemption for disposable diapers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1831 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1831 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: HB 1831 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-22HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-18HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-18HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 140 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseHouse Concurs (H) - SA 2 AYES: 140 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseTaken Up
2018-05-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-18HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-18SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SA2
2018-05-18SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 2 AYES: 18 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 2
2018-05-18SenateTaken Up
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 1 to SA 1 pending
2018-05-08SenateTaken Up
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-04-30SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-10SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-05SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 10, 2018, 9:00am, SCR 1
2018-03-29SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S)
2018-03-15HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-15HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
2018-03-15HouseTaken Up
2018-03-12HousePerfected (H)
2018-03-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-12HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
2018-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-13HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-02-13HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-29HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-17HouseReferred: Ways and Means(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-01-02HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback