MO HB1830 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that any person who disseminates false information relating to a perishable food product implying that the product is not safe for consumption will be liable to the food product producer
Title
Specifies that any person who disseminates false information relating to a perishable food product implying that the product is not safe for consumption will be liable to the food product producer
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House: HB 1830 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 131 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: HB 1830 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 27 N: 117 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - House: HB 1830 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 27 N: 117 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 27, 2016, noon or upon morning recess whichever comes later, SCR 1 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2016-03-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 23 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-02 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |