MO HB1828 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain persons who have lost the right to possess firearms to have their rights restored under certain circumstances
Title
Allows certain persons who have lost the right to possess firearms to have their rights restored under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 and HCA 2 AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1828&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1828I.PDF |