MO HB1824 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Rules - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Rules - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes guidelines for the regulation of occupations and professions not regulated by the Division of Professional Registration and those regulated professions that seek to substantially increase their scope of practice
Title
Establishes guidelines for the regulation of occupations and professions not regulated by the Division of Professional Registration and those regulated professions that seek to substantially increase their scope of practice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1824&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1824I.htm |