MO HB1822 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the six-month waiting period for certain persons to lobby to a two-year waiting period
Title
Changes the six-month waiting period for certain persons to lobby to a two-year waiting period
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Adams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1822&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4537H.01I.pdf |