MO HB1819 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the use of force and modifies provisions relating to firearms
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the use of force and modifies provisions relating to firearms
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1819&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1819I.PDF |