MO HB1815 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the normal and customary use of state park trails and roads from the prohibition on the use of the trails and roads without written permission from the Department of Natural Resources
Title
Exempts the normal and customary use of state park trails and roads from the prohibition on the use of the trails and roads without written permission from the Department of Natural Resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-05 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-27 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Rural Community Development (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |