MO HB1804 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the City of Kansas City to collect, upon voter approval, its existing convention and tourism tax from certain exempt transient guests and patrons of food establishments
Title
Authorizes the City of Kansas City to collect, upon voter approval, its existing convention and tourism tax from certain exempt transient guests and patrons of food establishments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-25 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-18 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-17 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 18, NOON, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 125 NOES: 22 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |