MO HB1797 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits law enforcement agencies from contracting with entities to provide instruction unless the instructors and curriculum have been approved by the POST commission
Title
Prohibits law enforcement agencies from contracting with entities to provide instruction unless the instructors and curriculum have been approved by the POST commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: Public Safety(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |