MO HB1794 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of "employment" as it relates to employment security laws regarding in-home or community-based services for clients of a county board for developmental disability services
Title
Clarifies the definition of "employment" as it relates to employment security laws regarding in-home or community-based services for clients of a county board for developmental disability services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-27 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-26 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-19 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services | |
2012-02-22 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |