MO HB1777 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an employee who is injured on the job to select his or her own health care provider to cure and relieve the effects of the injury at the expense of the employer
Title
Allows an employee who is injured on the job to select his or her own health care provider to cure and relieve the effects of the injury at the expense of the employer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1777&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1777I.htm |