MO HB1769 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Rules - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Rules - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the sale of general obligation bonds
Title
Changes the laws regarding the sale of general obligation bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |