MO HB1765 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a sales and use tax exemption for the sale of a used manufactured home
Title
Authorizes a sales and use tax exemption for the sale of a used manufactured home
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1765&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1765I.htm |