MO HB1760 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the board of aldermen in the City of Sugar Creek to provide by ordinance that the city marshal or chief of police be appointed instead of elected
Title
Allows the board of aldermen in the City of Sugar Creek to provide by ordinance that the city marshal or chief of police be appointed instead of elected
Sponsors
Rep. Ira Anders [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2012-02-17 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1760&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1760I.htm |