MO HB1759 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the "Year Manufactured" on an outboard motor title reflect the year the dealer purchased it from the manufacturer
Title
Requires that the "Year Manufactured" on an outboard motor title reflect the year the dealer purchased it from the manufacturer
Sponsors
Rep. Wanda Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-02-17 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1759&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1759I.htm |