MO HB1722 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding proprietary schools
Title
Changes the laws regarding proprietary schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-03 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-18 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-04-17 | Executive Session Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 18, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-10 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 11, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Education (S) | |
2012-04-02 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 010 | |
2012-03-28 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-03-28 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-01 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred: Higher Education (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |