MO HB1715 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-30 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-30 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes antibullying requirements for school districts
Title
Establishes antibullying requirements for school districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 30, 2024, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Select Committee on Empowering Missouri Parents and Children(S) |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 |
2024-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted |
2024-04-09 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-04-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2024-03-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |