MO HB1710 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-08 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-08 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation of property.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-06 - House - House: HB 1710 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: HB 1710 (*HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: HB 1710 (*HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: HB 1710 (*HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: HB 1710 (*HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics(S) |
2020-05-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-05-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 111 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 4 |
2020-05-06 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 HA 2, HA 2 as amended, HA 3, HA 4 adopted |
2020-05-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-05-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |