MO HB1700 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows public bodies to opt out of prevailing wage laws for the construction of public works projects that are $750,000 or less
Title
Allows public bodies to opt out of prevailing wage laws for the construction of public works projects that are $750,000 or less
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Lant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations(H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred: Workforce Standards and Development(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-09 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1700&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1700I.PDF |