MO HB170 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to the registering of roofing contractors.
Title
Creates provisions relating to the registering of roofing contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB170&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0356H.01I.pdf |