MO HB1699 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and establishes provisions relating to domestic violence
Title
Modifies and establishes provisions relating to domestic violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - House: HB 1699 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 25, 2022, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-03-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-03-28 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted. |
2022-03-23 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-03-23 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |