MO HB1698 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the ability of counties to issue ordinances.
Title
Changes the laws regarding the ability of counties to issue ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: HB 1698 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |