MO HB169 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a committee of the House of Representatives to review and issue reports on the audits of any state agency or department conducted by the State Auditor's Office
Title
Requires a committee of the House of Representatives to review and issue reports on the audits of any state agency or department conducted by the State Auditor's Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House: HB 169 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 123 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 12, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-06 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-01 | House | Perfected (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-03-01 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |