MO HB1685 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law relating to short term medical policies sold in the state of Missouri.
Title
Changes the law relating to short term medical policies sold in the state of Missouri.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House: HB 1685 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: HB 1685 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: HB 1685 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 8:05am, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Insurance and Banking(S) |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-13 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-13 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |