MO HB1678 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the secretary of state to inspect the voter rolls of any election authority
Title
Allows the secretary of state to inspect the voter rolls of any election authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |