MO HB1678 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public institutions of higher education to implement memorandums of understanding with law enforcement with respect to sexual assaults on campus
Title
Requires public institutions of higher education to implement memorandums of understanding with law enforcement with respect to sexual assaults on campus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House: HB 1678 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-21 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 20, 2016, 2:00pm, SCR 1 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 13, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-17 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-15 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-09 | House | Prefiled (H) |