MO HB1667 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a rebuttable presumption that child custody arrangements that award equal parenting time are in the best interest of the child

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a rebuttable presumption that child custody arrangements that award equal parenting time are in the best interest of the child

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - House - House: HB 1667 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-09SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-02SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-04-25SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-23SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 25, 2018, 8:00am, Senate Lounge
2018-04-12SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S)
2018-04-05HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-04-05HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-05HouseTaken Up
2018-03-28HousePerfected (H)
2018-03-28HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-03-28HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-28HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-07HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-07HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-06HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-30HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-18HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-18HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback