MO HB1645 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that for two years the daily expense allowance for members of the General Assembly will remain the same as the rate in effect on September 30, 2009
Title
Specifies that for two years the daily expense allowance for members of the General Assembly will remain the same as the rate in effect on September 30, 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-17 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred: Administration and Accounts (H) | |
2010-01-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1645&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1645I.htm |