MO HB1644 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding state agencies and departments by requiring the posting of information online that is published physically and making available the online submission of applications, forms, and payments
Title
Changes the laws regarding state agencies and departments by requiring the posting of information online that is published physically and making available the online submission of applications, forms, and payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1644&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4877H.01I.pdf |