MO HB1644 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the use of force by employees of the Department of Mental Health
Title
Changes the laws regarding the use of force by employees of the Department of Mental Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-04-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-31 | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) | |
2010-03-31 | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) | |
2010-03-31 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-01 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-24 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Public Hearing Continued (H) | |
2010-01-14 | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions (H) | |
2010-01-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |