MO HB1641 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the detention of persons under the age of seventeen in adult facilities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the detention of persons under the age of seventeen in adult facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-07 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-06 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1641&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1641I.PDF |