MO HB1633 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Executive Session - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Executive Session - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a telecommunications company to provide caller location information in certain emergency situations
Title
Requires a telecommunications company to provide caller location information in certain emergency situations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2010-02-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred: Utilities (H) | |
2010-01-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1633&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1633I.htm |