MO HB163 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Corrections and Public Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Corrections and Public Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Places restrictions on the television programming inmates have access to in correctional facilities
Title
Places restrictions on the television programming inmates have access to in correctional facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB163&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0296H.01I.pdf |