MO HB162 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the penalty for a willfully or knowingly causing excess drainage onto public roads
Title
Modifies the penalty for a willfully or knowingly causing excess drainage onto public roads
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House: HB 162 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-24 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-18 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-04-18 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-04-18 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-18 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |