MO HB1619 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a two-year statute of limitations for actions against a mental health professional for malpractice, negligence, error, or mistake
Title
Establishes a two-year statute of limitations for actions against a mental health professional for malpractice, negligence, error, or mistake
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - House - House: HB 1619 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 5, 2016, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge Amended |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 158 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2016-02-04 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-02 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Taken Up |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |