MO HB161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits local school districts from setting an opening date for the school term that is more than 14 calendar days prior to the first Monday in September.
Title
Prohibits local school districts from setting an opening date for the school term that is more than 14 calendar days prior to the first Monday in September.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House: HB 161 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: HB 161 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: HB 161 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: HB 161 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 89 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: HB 161 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: HB 161 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: HB 161 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 89 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 25, 2019, 9:00am, Pershing Conference Room |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 9, 2019, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 86 NOES: 64 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-06 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-04 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | HCS Adopted (H) - AYES: 89 NOES: 60 PRESENT: 3 |
2019-03-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-04 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |