MO HB1607 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the termination date of certain natural resources funds and fees.
Title
Extends the termination date of certain natural resources funds and fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Korman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House: HB 1607 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 9, 2018, 2:00pm, SCR 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-21 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to natural resorces funds |
2018-02-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed Back on Perfection Calendar |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |