MO HB1602 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Second read and referred: Senate Education(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Second read and referred: Senate Education(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the appointment of school board members in the event of vacancies
Title
Changes the laws regarding the appointment of school board members in the event of vacancies
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Ruth [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - House - House: HB 1602 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-07 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-08 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2016-02-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |