MO HB160 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Public Service Commission to authorize a low income rate for water and sewer service.
Title
Allows the Public Service Commission to authorize a low income rate for water and sewer service.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 160 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 160 (*HA 1 HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 46 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 160 (*HA 1 HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 46 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 2, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-21 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |