MO HB1597 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the next-of-kin of a deceased person to delegate control of the final disposition of the remains
Title
Authorizes the next-of-kin of a deceased person to delegate control of the final disposition of the remains
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: HB 1597 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-12 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 12, 2018, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-14 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-01-31 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |