MO HB1591 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the counties of Andrew and Buchanan to enact nuisance abatement ordinances and adds certain conditions for which county governing bodies may enact nuisance abatement ordinances
Title
Authorizes the counties of Andrew and Buchanan to enact nuisance abatement ordinances and adds certain conditions for which county governing bodies may enact nuisance abatement ordinances
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Hobbs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred: Crime Prevention (H) | |
2010-01-13 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1591&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1591I.htm |