MO HB1589 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that certain felons must be eligible for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) benefits
Title
Specifies that certain felons must be eligible for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: Children, Families, and Persons with Disabilities(H) |
2014-01-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1589&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1589I.htm |