MO HB1583 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding bullying in schools and establishes specific components that a district must include in its antibullying policy
Title
Changes the laws regarding bullying in schools and establishes specific components that a district must include in its antibullying policy
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1583 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 110 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1583 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1583 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 124 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House: HB 1583 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: HB 1583 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1583 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1583 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 124 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House: HB 1583 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: HB 1583 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-03 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-10 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 124 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS as amended AYES: 124 NOES: 22 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2016-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-05-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 1 |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-09 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-04 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 27, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 20, 2016, 2:00 PM, Senate Committee Room 1/Amended |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2016-03-14 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-14 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-09 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended and HA 2 |
2016-03-09 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |