MO HB1576 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a commission on capitol security infrastructure
Title
Establishes a commission on capitol security infrastructure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - House - House: HB 1576 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 136 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 1, 2016, 8:45am, Senate Lounge |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 136 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |