MO HB1568 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to seclusion and restraint policies in public schools.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to seclusion and restraint policies in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 1568 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 12:00 pm, Tuesday, April 28, 2020, Joint Committee Room |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2020-03-04 | House | HCS#2 Adopted (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-13 | House | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Elementary & Secondary Education AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |