MO HB1540 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-14 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S)
Pending: Senate Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Permits recording of IEP or Section 504 meetings by a student's parent or legal guardian.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits recording of IEP or Section 504 meetings by a student's parent or legal guardian.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House: HB 1540 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-14SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S)
2020-05-13SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-05-11SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2020-05-08SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-05-08SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-04-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-04-27SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 28, 2020, 12:00 p.m, Joint Committee Room
2020-03-12SenateSecond read and referred: Education(S)
2020-03-09HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-03-05HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
2020-03-05HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-03-03HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, and HA 5 adopted
2020-03-03HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2020-03-03HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-03-03HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-01-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-30HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-27HouseAction Postponed (H)
2020-01-27HouseExecutive Session Continued
2020-01-23HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-01-23HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-22HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-22HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-14HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-02HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback