MO HB1536 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to employment modifying work hours on school nights for certain students less than eighteen years of age
Title
Modifies provisions relating to employment modifying work hours on school nights for certain students less than eighteen years of age
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |