MO HB1522 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the licensure of a provisionally licensed behavior analyst and assistant behavior analyst and a temporary licensed behavior analyst and assistant behavior analyst
Title
Authorizes the licensure of a provisionally licensed behavior analyst and assistant behavior analyst and a temporary licensed behavior analyst and assistant behavior analyst
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-02-28 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-23 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Committee Vote to Reconsider (H) - MOTION TO DO PASS AND MOTION TO ADOPT HCS | |
2012-02-13 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services | |
2012-01-26 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1522&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1522I.htm |