MO HB1516 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that licensed chiropractic physicians may treat and be reimbursed for conditions currently reimbursed under MO HealthNet
Title
Specifies that licensed chiropractic physicians may treat and be reimbursed for conditions currently reimbursed under MO HealthNet
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: HB 1516 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: HB 1516 General (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: HB 1516 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: HB 1516 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: HB 1516 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: HB 1516 General (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: HB 1516 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: HB 1516 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 10, 2018, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 23, 2018, 2:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Professional Registration(S) |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-03-29 | House | Re-Perfected (H) |
2018-03-29 | House | SEE COMMENTS - Adoption of HSA 1 |
2018-03-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider - Vote to reconsider HA 1 AYES: 139 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-29 | House | SEE COMMENTS - HA 2 withdrawn |
2018-03-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider - adoption of HA 2 AYES: 138 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider Perfection - AYES: 131 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |